Moyer v. DVA Renal Healthcare Inc

Plaintiff: Vickie S Moyer
Defendant: DVA Renal Healthcare Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv00087
Filed: January 30, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of DVA Renal Healthcare Inc against Vickie S Moyer pursuant to the Court's 37 Order entered March 27, 2009, awarding costs to DVA Renal Healthcare in the sum of $2,804.66, said amount due and payable immediately by plaintiff to defendant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/30/09. (bkp) Modified on 3/31/2009 (bkp).
March 27, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Bill of Costs filed by DVA Renal Healthcare Inc and awarding costs in the amount of $2,804.66 to defendant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/27/09. (bkp)
February 20, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order of this date, granting defendants motion for summary judgment, plaintiff's complaint must be dismissed with prejudice against defendant. It is therefore ordered that Judgment be, and it is hereby, entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. It is further ordered that the complaint be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/20/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer v. DVA Renal Healthcare Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie S Moyer
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVA Renal Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?