Brown v. J B Hunt Transport Services Inc

Plaintiff: Barbara Brown
Defendant: J B Hunt Transport Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv00089
Filed: January 31, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal-ERISA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 151 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/27/12. (kpr)
October 20, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 137 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's response to Prudential's motion for summary judgment is due by 7 November 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/11. (kpr)
January 15, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion for Attorney Fees with prejudice; denying 109 Motion for Bill of Costs without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/15/10. (bkp)
December 17, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 104 USCA Opinion and vacating this Court's findings as to plaintiff's claims for benefits as set out in Count I and remanding the case to Prudential for an out-of-time appeal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/17/09. (bkp)
November 26, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 94 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/26/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. J B Hunt Transport Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Hunt Transport Services Inc
Represented By: Charles W. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Brown
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?