Tanner et al v. Entergy Corporation

Plaintiff: Eddie Rasberry, Kevin Tanner, Anthony Foot, Dontae Myles, Lacy Miles, James Walker and John Doe
Defendant: Entergy Corporation
Case Number: 4:2008cv00099
Filed: February 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing attorneys to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse from July 13 through 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/10/09. (bkp)
July 6, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment as to James Walker; denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Lacy Miles; and granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Kevin Tanner. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/6/09. (bkp)
June 8, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Sever and for separate trials. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/8/09. (mkf)
June 2, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss the claims of Eddie Rasberry without prejudice for his failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/2/09. (bkp)
May 21, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the claims of plaintiffs Anthony Foot and Dontae Myles without prejudice: Plaintiff Raspberry is directed to respond to the outstanding discovery on or before May 26, 2 009 and to make himself available for a deposition on or before May 29, 2009; extending the disposition motions ddl to June 12, 2009 and responses to dispositive motions are due on or before June 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/21/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner et al v. Entergy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Rasberry
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Tanner
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Foot
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontae Myles
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Miles
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walker
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Rickey H. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?