Bumgardner v. Benton, City of et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Doyle Bumgardner, Jr
Defendant: Benton, City of, Benton Police Department, Gary Sipes, Daniel Creasey and David Richey
Case Number: 4:2008cv00202
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 43 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Defts' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/08. (vjt)
December 10, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the defts are entitled to judgment as a matter of law and their motion for summary judgment be granted 30 . Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/10/2008. (lej)
October 22, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 34 plaintiff until November 24, 2008 in which to reply to defts motion for summary judgment 34 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/22/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumgardner v. Benton, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Doyle Bumgardner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Creasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?