TE Products Pipeline Company LLC v. Davidson Ranch Inc
Plaintiff: TE Products Pipeline Company LLC
Defendant: Davidson Ranch Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv00204
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER directing the clerk of court to refund to TE Products Pipeline Company, LLC its deposit of $2,000.00. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/16/10. (bkp)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Vacate and vacating 62 Judgment, 61 and Order dated June 1, 2009, and dismissing the Complaint and Counterclaim with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/09. (bkp)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT 61 Order dismissing all plaintiff's claims with prejudice and dismissing defendant's counterclaims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/09. (bkp) (VACATED AND SET ASIDE BY ORDER DATED 12/18/09.) Modified on 12/18/2009 (bkp).
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER authorizing electronic devices to be used in the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse for the persons and dates set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/13/09. (bkp)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Hearing; denying 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/2/09. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TE Products Pipeline Company LLC v. Davidson Ranch Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TE Products Pipeline Company LLC
Represented By: Meredith Blaise Switzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Ranch Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?