Brown v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Brian Chance Brown
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv00335
Filed: April 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 05:704 Labor Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 deft's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/24/09. (bkp)
December 15, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending discovery ddl up to and including February 16, 2009, to allow the Court an opportunity to consider the pending 18 MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production filed by Brian Chance Brown and anticipated response. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/08. (bkp)
December 10, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel and directing the deft to provide full and complete answers to the first set of interrogs propounded by pltf within ten days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/10/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chance Brown
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?