Benton Workshop Inc v. USA

Plaintiff: Benton Workshop Inc
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2008cv00339
Filed: April 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 26:6532 IRS: Refund of Tax Penalty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 Request filed by Benton Workshop Inc approving the amount of $1,200.77 for the depositions and copying costs, and permitting the United States of America to recover that amount. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/4/09. (bkp)
August 21, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Benton Workshop Inc re 29 Order granting deft's Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/21/09. (bkp)
July 15, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Mr. James Brown re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA and directing Mr. Brown to file any response he may have by 12:00 noon on Wednesday, July 22, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/15/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benton Workshop Inc v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benton Workshop Inc
Represented By: James Allen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?