Steinbuch v. Hachette Book Group Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert Steinbuch
Defendant: Hachette Book Group
Case Number: 4:2008cv00456
Filed: May 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER pursuant to the Consent Motion for a Continued Stay (Document #168 in case 4:06CV00620), this consolidated action is hereby STAYED for a period of 45 days. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/6/09. (vjt)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Stay and staying this consolidated action for a period of 45 days. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/21/09. (bkp)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 54 MOTION to Stay (Consent Motion for a Stay) by Hachette Book Group (Stone, Clayborne)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 52 ORDER denying as moot pltf's 31 motion to amend complaint; CONSOLIDATING CASE 4:06cv620 with LEAD CASE 4:08cv456; Steinbuch is directed to file his amended complaint in Case No. 4:08cv456 naming Hyperion and Hachette as defts (deft Cutler has been dismissed), within 30 days of the entry of this Order; upon the filing of the amended complaint in Case No. 4:08cv456, Case No. 4:06cv620 will be administratively terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/29/09. (vjt)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 50 AMENDED 45 ORDER, Pltf's reply brief attached to his 40 MOTION for Leave to File a reply brief is hereby deemed as being filed on June 18, 2009. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/09. (vjt)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 49 RESPONSE 48 to defendant's "Letter" and Notice of Additional Authority by Robert Steinbuch (jap)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 48 NOTICE by Hachette Book Group re 47 Response to Motion (Anderson, Philip)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 47 RESPONSE to defendant's motion 41 to File a Sur-Reply regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend filed by Robert Steinbuch. (jap)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER granting Pltf's 40 Motion for Leave to File a reply brief in support of his motion to amend; the proposed reply brief was attached to the motion, the Clerk is directed to docket the attached reply brief filed on 6/18/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/29/09. (vjt)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION for Leave to File (Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend) filed by Hachette Book Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 42 ORDER granting Deft's 41 Motion for Leave to File surreply in opposition to Pltf's motion for leave to amend; Deft must file its surreply within 5 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/25/09. (vjt)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 41 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend by Hachette Book Group (Stone, Clayborne)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 40 MOTION for Leave to File reply brief in support of its motion to amend by Robert Steinbuch (jap)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Nathan E. Siegel and John B. O'Keefe to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for Hachette Book Group. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/5/09. (vjt)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 37 ADDENDUM to 36 Brief in Opposition. Exhibit 1, Book, received conventionally and maintained in the Clerk's office. (kjp)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 36 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION filed by Hachette Book Group re 31 Motion to Amend/Correct (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Stone, Clayborne)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) by Hachette Book Group (Stone, Clayborne)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER granting Deft's 32 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/5/09 to respond to Pltf's 31 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/20/09. (vjt)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Hachette Book Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct complaint with proposed Amended Complaint attached by Robert Steinbuch (jap)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 29 OPINION AND ORDER granting Deft's 12 Motion to Dismiss; finding that Pltf's complaint fails to state a claim for relief against Hachette Book Group, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice; if Pltf wishes to seek leave to amend, he must comply with this Order within 30 days; failure to comply will result in the Court entering a final order dismissing this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/8/09. (vjt)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 28 NOTICE by Hachette Book Group re 12 First MOTION to Dismiss Letter to Judge J. Leon Holmes (Anderson, Philip)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 27 REPLY by Pltf to Deft's 26 Response to Notice of Additional Authorities re 12 MOTION to Dismiss. (vjt) (copy mailed)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 26 RESPONSE in Support re 12 First MOTION to Dismiss (Response to Plaintiff's Second Notice of Additional Authorities) filed by Hachette Book Group. (Stone, Clayborne)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 25 NOTICE of Additional Authorities by Pltf re Deft's 24 Response to Pltf's previous 22 Notice of Additional Authorities, concerning 12 Deft's First MOTION to Dismiss. (vjt) (copy mailed)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 First MOTION to Dismiss re Plaintiff's Notice of Additional filed by Hachette Book Group. (Stone, Clayborne)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 22 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by Pltf re Deft's Reply Brief to its 12 MOTION to Dismiss. (vjt) (copy mailed)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hachette Book Group. (Anderson, Philip)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER granting 18 Deft's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; Deft must file its reply brief on or before 1/9/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/08. (vjt)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order 18 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Hachette Book Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Document 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Document 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(bkp)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER granting Pltf's 14 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/15/08 to respond to Deft's 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/5/08. (vjt)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 12 First MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Steinbuch. (thd)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hachette Book Group re 12 Motion to Dismiss (Anderson, Philip)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order 12 First MOTION to Dismiss by Hachette Book Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Philip)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting Deft's 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Pltf's complaint; Hachette Book Group answer due 10/21/2008. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/14/08. (vjt)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order 9 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Plead by Hachette Book Group (Stone, Clayborne)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/29/08. (bfw)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant shall have until October 14, 2008, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/24/2008. (ere)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order 5 MOTION to Extend Time by Hachette Book Group (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stone, Clayborne)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of all defendants (King, Andrew)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayborne S. Stone on behalf of all defendants (Stone, Clayborne)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip S. Anderson on behalf of all defendants (Anderson, Philip)
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hachette Bank Group (Filing fee $350.00, receipt #LIT0011934), filed by Robert Steinbuch, (summons issued and returned to plaintiff) (jap) (Modified entry on 5/29/2008 to correct docket text) (bfw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinbuch v. Hachette Book Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Steinbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?