Perry et al v. Ice House America LLC

Plaintiff: D Scott Perry, Cold Water Distributing LLC and Best Ice LLC
Defendant: Ice House America LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv00501
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 43 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by the parties, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/11. (vjt)
February 18, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Ice House America to submit a status report on or before 3/1/11, and every 3 months thereafter until the stay is lifted or this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/18/11. (vjt)
October 18, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 34 ORDER granting 32 MOTION of Joe D. Calhoun and Tony A. DiCarlo III to Withdraw as counsel of record for pltfs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/10. (vjt)
July 24, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to submit an updated status report on or before September 12, 2009. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/24/09. (mkf)
September 12, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying case pending arbitration pursuant to 13 Opinion and Order; the parties must submit a status report within 6 months of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Ice House America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D Scott Perry
Represented By: Tony A. DiCarlo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cold Water Distributing LLC
Represented By: Tony A. DiCarlo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Ice LLC
Represented By: Tony A. DiCarlo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice House America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?