Ford et al v. Townsends of Arkansas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Donovan Ford, Carrie Galan, James Gilmer, Judy Mills and Billie J Norris
Defendant: Townsends of Arkansas Inc and Townsends Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv00509
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Independence
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2011 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding this case in abeyance pending resolution of defts' January 3, 2011 bankruptcy petition 238 and directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case pending resolution of defts' bankruptcy petition. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/25/11. (bkp)
December 8, 2010 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 230 Motion for Protective Order; denying 232 Motion to Compel and granting plaintiff's motion for an order in limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/8/10. (bkp)
May 24, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on briefs, affidavits, proposed notices and stipulations ruling as set forth in this Order. 132 139 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/24/10. (bkp)
April 9, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' 50 63 Motions for conditional certification and appointing plaintiffs' counsel, Zimmerman Reed P.L.L.P. and Larson King, LLP, as counsel for this action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/9/10. (bkp)
January 21, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 106 Motion to Dismiss; granting 108 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and dismissing the putative class of persons in North Carolina without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/21/10. (bkp)
October 2, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding in abeyance all impending ddls and outstanding motions until the Court's ruling on plaintiffs' motion (Doc. No. 83). Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/2/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford et al v. Townsends of Arkansas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Ford
Represented By: Robert Thompson Veon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Galan
Represented By: Robert Thompson Veon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gilmer
Represented By: Robert Thompson Veon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Mills
Represented By: Robert Thompson Veon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie J Norris
Represented By: Robert Thompson Veon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsends of Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsends Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?