Hughes v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: James Hughes
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2008cv00545
Filed: June 16, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2005 Review of Agency Action-HHS

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Social Security Administration against James Hughes re 25 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/8/09. (bkp)
June 17, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the final determination of the Commissioner be affirmed and pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice 3 . Objections to R&R due by 7/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/17/2009. (lej)
November 24, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER giving pltf up to and including 12/15/08 to file a brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/24/2008. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hughes
Represented By: G. Gregory Niblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?