Agri-Process Innovations Inc et al v. Greenline Industries LLC

Plaintiff: Agri-Process Innovations Inc and AP Fabrications LLC
Defendant: Greenline Industries LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv00558
Filed: June 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 Stipulation of Dismissal dismissing case with prejudice and rendering all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/9/09. (bkp)
February 4, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/4/09. (bkp)
November 3, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/08. (bkp)
October 17, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Consolidate Cases making this case the lead case and 4:08-cv-03581-SWW the member case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/17/08. (bkp)
September 4, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer or Stay Plaintiffs' Substituted Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/4/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agri-Process Innovations Inc et al v. Greenline Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agri-Process Innovations Inc
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AP Fabrications LLC
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenline Industries LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?