Lee v. Browenlee et al

Plaintiff: Sherman Francis Lee
Defendant: Leroy Browenlee, Renolds, A Robison and Does
Case Number: 4:2008cv00627
Filed: July 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/12/09. (bkp)
December 30, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Adopting the Proposed Findings and Recommendations of U.S. Magistrate Jerry W. Cavaneau. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/30/08. (bkp)
December 8, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 14 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/8/08. (bkp)
October 22, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Pltf's case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim; any pending motions be DENIED AS MOOT; the Court certify that an ifp appeal from any order and judgment adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith; an action dismissed w/o prej under Heck count as a "STRIKE" purs to 28 USC 1915(g); Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/22/08. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Browenlee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Francis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Browenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?