Webb et al v. Riceland Foods Inc

Plaintiff: Roger Webb, Harold West and Joann West
Defendant: Riceland Foods Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv01048
Filed: August 13, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) directing the transfer of this case to the Eastern District of Missouri to become part of MDL No. 1811. Signed by Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(mkf)
November 17, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court; 26 Motion for Reconsideration and 29 MOTION to Strike are GRANTED; 9 Pltfs' MOTION to Remand to State Court is DENIED; the Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation and the Circuit Court of Lonoke County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/17/08. (mkf)
November 4, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand to State Court; this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Lonoke County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/4/08. (mkf) Modified on 11/17/2008 to reflect this Order has been VACATED pursuant to 33 Order (mkf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb et al v. Riceland Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Webb
Represented By: James J. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold West
Represented By: James J. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann West
Represented By: James J. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riceland Foods Inc
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?