Lipkins v. 3M Company

Plaintiff: Gary Lipkins
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv01512
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 67 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/26/10. (bkp)
May 13, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Extend Time; denying 39 Motion to Strike ; denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/13/10. (bkp)
April 13, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the trial of this matter until Tuesday, October 5, 2010, at 9:30 a.m.; directing plaintiff to two-block her affidavits on or before 5:00 p.m., Thursday, May 13th. Deft is directed to file supplemental papers, if it wishes to do so, by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, May 27, 2010; and keeping the motion to strike and for summary judgment under consideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/13/10. (bkp)
August 13, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Reconsideration and extending the dispositive motions ddl to September 16, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/13/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipkins v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lipkins
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?