Griffis et al v. Anadarko E&P Company LP et al

Plaintiff: Larry Griffis, Onita Griffis, Carolyn Hudson, Scott Pevehouse, Rebekah Pevehouse, Stan Yingling and Benita Yingling
Defendant: Anadarko E&P Company LP, Anadarko Land Corporation, Upland Industrial Development Company and Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv01974
Filed: September 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Based on 47 Order, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/24/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 8/25/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
August 17, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel directing them to reply to this letter by noon, Thursday, August 20, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/17/09. (bkp)
August 5, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing plaintiffs' to provide the Court with a letter brief by Wednesday, August 12, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/5/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffis et al v. Anadarko E&P Company LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Griffis
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onita Griffis
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Hudson
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Pevehouse
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Pevehouse
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Yingling
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Yingling
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko E&P Company LP
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Land Corporation
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upland Industrial Development Company
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration LLC
Represented By: Winston Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?