Reed v. Pfizer Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mae Frances Reed
Defendant: Pfizer Inc, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC, Greenstone Ltd, Barr Laboratories Inc, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bristol Myers Squibb Company, Warner Chilcott US Inc and Mead Johnson & Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv03121
Filed: September 24, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide any additional evidentiary support for claims against generic manufacturers by 5 p.m., Monday, May 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/06/2013. (jak)
April 1, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff(s) to file FDA correspondence and, if needed, an Addendum to the Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m. on 4/8/2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/01/2013. (jak) (Docket text modified on 4/1/2013 to remove duplicate text.) (thd).
September 11, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs are permitted to amend their individual complaints within 3 weeks of the date of this Order.Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/11/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Pfizer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Marie L van Uitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
Represented By: Marie L van Uitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Marie L van Uitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC
Represented By: Marie L van Uitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone Ltd
Represented By: Marie L van Uitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Tracy J. Van Steenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Tracy J. Van Steenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Tracy J. Van Steenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott US Inc
Represented By: Melissa M. Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company
Represented By: Frederick W. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Frances Reed
Represented By: Ted Gordon Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?