Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Rock-Tenn Company

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Rock-Tenn Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv03127
Filed: September 24, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/1/11. (hph)
July 11, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 121 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/11/2011. (kdr)
June 24, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion in Limine; denying 52 Motion in Limine; granting 57 Motion in Limine; granting 70 Motion in Limine; granting 72 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/24/11. (kpr)
June 22, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion in Limine; denying 61 Motion in Limine; denying 63 Motion in Limine; denying 65 Motion for Order; denying 67 Motion in Limine; denying 80 Motion in Limine; granting 82 Motion in Limine; granting 84 Motion in Limine; denying 86 Motion in Limine; granting 88 Motion in Limine; denying 90 Motion in Limine; granting 92 Motion in Limine; denying 94 Motion in Limine; denying 96 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/22/11. (kpr)
June 20, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Pamela Dixon, Faye Williams, Markeisha Savage and Joseph M. Crout to bring certain electronics into the Courthouse beginning Monday, June 27, 2011, and each day thereafter until the trial is completed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/20/11. (kpr)
June 16, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Reconsideration and granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Amend/Correct the 39 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 46 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/16/11. (kpr)
March 31, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/31/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Rock-Tenn Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock-Tenn Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?