Jackson v. Norris

Plaintiff: Artie Jackson
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 4:2008cv03319
Filed: September 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 60 Order entered this date, Mr. Jackson's personal recognizance bond is hereby revoked; and he is ordered to surrender to the Pulaski County Detention Center in Little Rock, on or before 12:00 p.m. on Monday, March 12, 2012, to complete his sentence in the ADC. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/2/12. (vjt)
August 26, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED and SUBSTITUTED JUDGMENT re 20 Judgment is VACATED, for the reasons stated in 19 Memorandum Order, 35 Order. Petitioner Artie Jacksons § 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. His state convictions are hereby set aside. Pending review of this Courts ruling, Petitioner Jackson shall be released from custody on a personal recognizance bond based on Fed. R. App. P. 23(c). Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/26/10, Nunc Pro Tunc, July 20, 2010. (dac)
August 25, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Stay; granting 30 Motion for Order of Release. The Arkansas Department of Corrections is hereby directed to release Petitioner Artie Jackson forthwith and to permit him to remain free on a personal recognizance bond, without surety. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/25/10. (dac)
July 20, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 19 Memorandum and Order granting petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 7/20/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artie Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?