Crain CDJ LLC et al v. Regency Conversions LLC

Plaintiff: Crain CDJ LLC, Crain Ford Inc and Crain Chevrolet LLC
Defendant: Regency Conversions LLC
Case Number: 4:2008cv03605
Filed: October 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/26/10. (bkp)
December 4, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Compel; denying 53 Motion for Sanctions and directing the parties to update the Court on the production of documents by 5:00 p.m., Monday, December 21, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/4/09. (bkp)
September 22, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Compel and directing the plaintiffs to provide defendants with the requested discovery information by 5 p.m., Tuesday, September 29, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/22/09. (bkp)
April 9, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 45 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Ruling but denying 25 defts' Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/9/09. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 4/9/2009 to correct the linkage and the description of the document filed.) (thd)
April 2, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Default Judgment as to Separate Defendant Regency Conversions LLC; Judgment entered in the amount of $402,522.91. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/2/09. (mkf)
November 24, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 25 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/24/08. (mkf)
November 7, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss in connection with Counts One, Two, and Three of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Counts One and Two of Plaintiffs' Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice; Count Three of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/7/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain CDJ LLC et al v. Regency Conversions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crain CDJ LLC
Represented By: Winston Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crain Ford Inc
Represented By: Winston Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crain Chevrolet LLC
Represented By: Winston Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Conversions LLC
Represented By: Brooks Christopher White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?