Jackson v. Bauxite School District et al

Plaintiff: Penny Jackson
Defendant: Bauxite School District, Mickey Billingsley and Roberson
Case Number: 4:2008cv03610
Filed: October 10, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 113 MOTION for Order Motion Ordering Collection and Distribution of Garnished Funds filed by Penny Jackson. The Garnishee is ordered to remit the property or money to Holleman & Associates, P.A., as set forth in this Order, after which time the Garnishee shall be discharged and dismissed without further liability herein. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/2/10. (bkp)
September 2, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 85 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 89 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 97 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/2/10. (bkp)
August 30, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; finding as moot 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/30/10. (bkp)
August 5, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 92 ORDER granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Relief. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/5/2010. (thd)
August 4, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Penny Jackson against Bauxite School District, Mickey Billingsley, Sammy Roberson re 92 Order on Motion for Relief in the total sum of $74,001.56, with interest at the rate of 0.30% per annum until paid in full. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/4/10. (bkp)
April 21, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER TO COUNSEL RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FRONT PAY directing plaintiff to submit additional briefing by 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, May 12, 2010; and deft to respond by 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, May 26, 2010, with originals sent to the Clerk and copies to opposing counsel and the Court. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/21/10. (bkp)
March 8, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel directing plaintiff to brief the issue of front pay, attorney's fees and expenses before 5 p.m., Monday, March 15, 2010. Defendant should respond by 5 p.m., Monday, March 22, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/8/10. (bkp)
March 4, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Paul Blume to bring certain electronics into the courthouse while attending the jury trial on Tuesday, March 2, 2010, pursuant to Amended General Order No. 54. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/4/10. (bkp)
February 23, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/23/10. (bkp)
October 8, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion to Strike; any causes of action under Title VII against Defendants Billingsley and Roberson in their individual capacities are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/8/09. (mkf)
June 22, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re discovery; and directing deft Sammy Roberson to comply with the discovery request by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, June 25, 2009; and setting a telephone conference for Friday, June 26, 2009, at 1:45 p.m.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/22/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Bauxite School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Jackson
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bauxite School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?