Martin v. University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences

Plaintiff: Carolyn Martin
Defendant: University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Case Number: 4:2008cv03617
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons and complaint on deft University of Arkansas Board of Trustees in this action without costs; and withdrawing the Initial Scheduling Order, which will be refiled after the deft has been served and has answered. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/7/09. (bkp)
January 5, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to be familiar and comply with all Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/5/09. (bkp)
December 30, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing UAMS as the defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/30/08. (bkp)
December 15, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before December 31, 2008, to name the University of Arkansas or the Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas as the defendant in this case, or the Court will dismiss the case for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/08. (bkp)
October 28, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons and complaint on the defts in this action without costs. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/28/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?