Williams et al v. Dolgencorp Inc et al

Plaintiff: Leslie Brown and Mary Williams
Defendant: Dolgencorp Inc, Tom O'Connell and Sheila Padella
Case Number: 4:2008cv04157
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/30/09. (bkp)
October 8, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER awarding attorney fees in the amount of $3,000. to defendants against Alvin Leonard Simes re 38 Order on Motion for Contempt, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/08/09. (mkf)
August 13, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Contempt; granting 35 Motion for Attorney Fees and dismissing complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the court's order dated June 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/13/09. (bkp)
March 20, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 6 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Dolgencorp Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Brown
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Padella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?