Fowlkes v. Crye-Leike Inc et al

Plaintiff: Crystal Y Fowlkes
Defendant: Crye-Leike Inc and Crye-Leike of Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv04161
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 91 Order entered today, Crye-Leike, Inc's and Crye-Leike of Arkansas, Inc.'s counterclaim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/28/2011. (dmn)
March 18, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the parties' 42 66 MOTIONS for Sanctions and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/18/10. (bkp)
March 16, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Crye-Leike Inc, Crye-Leike of Arkansas Inc against Crystal Y Fowlkes re 73 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/16/10. (bkp)
February 25, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/25/10. (bkp)
February 12, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/12/10. (bkp)
January 19, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Quash and directing the parties to notify the court by 11:00 a.m. on Friday, January 22, 2010, if they are unable to agree as to a convenient time for the deposition. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/19/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowlkes v. Crye-Leike Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Y Fowlkes
Represented By: James Cody Hiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crye-Leike Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crye-Leike of Arkansas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?