Jezwinski v. Jacksonville Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Kathryn Jezwinski
Defendant: Jacksonville Arkansas, City of and Susan Davitt
Case Number: 4:2008cv04211
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER granting 76 motion of the parties to set aside and vacate the judgment based on settlement. The judgment entered on 7/13/2011, is hereby vacated and set aside. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/5/2011. (dmn)
July 13, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 67 Jury Verdict in favor of Kathryn Jezwinski against Jacksonville Arkansas, City of in the sum of $186,000.00, together with interest thereon from this date until paid at the rate of.19% per annum, as provided by law, and costs as the Court may find allowable. Issues regarding attorneys' fees, reinstatement, or front pay are reserved. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/11. (kpr)
May 25, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 53 Motions for Discovery and directing defts to make Nikki Wilmoth available to pltf's counsel for deposition and to pay for said deposition. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/25/11. (kpr)
May 23, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 50 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/23/11. (kpr)
November 10, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 11/30/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jezwinski v. Jacksonville Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Jezwinski
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Davitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?