Collins v. Widler

Plaintiff: Rodney Collins
Defendant: Mitch Widler
Case Number: 4:2008cv04228
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/8/10. (bkp)
July 1, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Defendant Widler's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Defendant Widler can subpoena Christopher Travis to authenticate the 9/22/08 letter & to explain its contents. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/1/2010. (jct)
June 22, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft Widler's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying pltf. Collins's 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/22/10. (bkp)
June 26, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Widler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Collins
Represented By: Kelly Wayne McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Widler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?