Jackson v. University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences

Plaintiff: Barbara J Jackson
Defendant: University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Case Number: 4:2008cv04234
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal and dismissing claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/09. (bkp)
December 3, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Compel and directing plaintiff Jackson to provide responses to the outstanding discovery on or before December 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/09. (bkp)
May 18, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Bill of Costs and directing the Clerk of the Clerk to distribute to Dennis J. Davis the total amount of $41.31 from the Out-of-Pocket Expenses Fund. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/18/09. (bkp)
February 19, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff is directed to file her Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, March 5, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/19/09. (mkf)
January 6, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant in this action w/o costs pursuant to the provisions of Rule 4 of the FRcvP. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/6/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas for Medical Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?