Bevans v. Conway, City of et al

Plaintiff: Jon Bevans
Defendant: Conway, City of, Tab Townsell, Andy Hawkins, David Grimes, Mark Vaught, Shelley Mehl, Jack Bell, Mary Smith, Theodore Jones, Jr, Shelia Whitmore, Conway Police Department, A J Gary, Jason Cameron and John Does
Case Number: 4:2009cv00016
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts pursuant to 40 Order granting defts' motion to dismiss and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/5/10. (bkp)
January 19, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding in abeyance 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jon Bevans for 30 days during which Bevans is directed to either obtain new counsel, or state his intentions to proceed ifp and provide the court with his contact information, and directing Morgan Welch to provide Bevans with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/19/10. (bkp)
January 4, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Sanctions; granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and directing Bevans to provide responses to outstanding discovery on or before January 18, 2010; extending discovery ddl to on or before February 17, 2010; and extending the ddl for filing of dispositive motions to March 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/4/10. (bkp)
February 18, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Party; Conway Police Department is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/18/09. (mkf)
February 3, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and cancelling the hearing scheduled for February 4, 2009, at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/3/09. (bkp)
January 16, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO and setting for hearing plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on January 28, 2009, at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/16/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 1/22/2009 to correct typographical error.) (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bevans v. Conway, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Bevans
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tab Townsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Mehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A J Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?