Palm Properties LLC v. Capitol Development of Arkansas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Palm Properties LLC
Defendant: Capitol Development of Arkansas Inc, Prime Realty & Investments Inc, Indy 10 LLC and Metropolitan Title Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00038
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 118 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; denying 119 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 122 Motion to Stay; denying 123 Motion to Reopen Case; denying 124 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/22/10. (bkp)
June 30, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 112 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Palm Properties LLC against C-Metro Inc; after 14 days from the entry of this Judgment, the funds in the amount of $124,650.43 plus accrued interest will be released to Palm Properties LLC from the registry of the Court unless a motion for stay is filed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/10. (vjt)
June 21, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing R. David Lewis and J. Fred Hart, counsel for pltf in this matter, to bring electronic devices into the federal courthouse between June 21, 2010, and June 22, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/21/10. (vjt)
June 8, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Final Scheduling Order, the Court has determined that the Bench Trial will begin at 9:15 a.m., on Monday, June 21, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/8/10. (vjt)
June 7, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 81 C-Metro's Motion for Summary Judgment and Palm Properties' 100 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/10. (vjt)
May 19, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice plaintiff's claims against Capitol Development of Arkansas, Inc., Prime Realty & Investments, Inc., Indy 10, LLC, Boca Funding Group, LLC, Howard Bloom and Ashley Bloom ("the Bloom defendants") and excusing the Bloom defts from participation in the settlement conference scheduled for Saturday, May 22, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/10. (bkp)
February 24, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Palm Properties LLC is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/24/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Properties LLC v. Capitol Development of Arkansas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Properties LLC
Represented By: Bruce B. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Development of Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Ray Smith Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Realty & Investments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indy 10 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Title Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?