Wright et al v. Pulaski County

Plaintiff: Mae Wright, Gussie Parham, Debra Adams, Mildred Champion, Kelvin Johnson, Christine Smith and Gary Tyree
Defendant: Pulaski County
Case Number: 4:2009cv00065
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 208 Joint Motion to Dismiss; this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE upon settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/29/11. (vjt)
February 2, 2011 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 203 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Separate Plaintiffs Sterling Boston, Alice Culberson, Phyllis Goodman, Brenda Jones, Wendy Pierce, Eugene Rouse & Tiffany Slaughter. The claims of those named separate Plaintiffs are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, & those plaintiffs are dismissed as parties to this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
August 24, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part deft's 146 Motion for Summary Judgment; deft's motion is granted to the extent that pltfs' claims based on donning and doffing uniforms and volunteer time are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf s' claims for compensation based on an early report requirement and missed lunch breaks remain; pltfs' 160 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; deft's 151 Motion for Decertification is GRANTED; the claims of opt-in pltfs are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/24/10. (vjt)
August 6, 2010 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice deft's 149 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/6/10. (vjt)
May 20, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescinding 179 Scheduling Order issued on May 20, 2010. The scheduling order issued April 8, 2010 (176) remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/20/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Wright
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gussie Parham
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Adams
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Champion
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Johnson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Smith
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tyree
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?