Ameri v. Bailey et al

Plaintiff: Nasser Ahmed Ameri
Defendant: Bermard C Bailey, Bill Sheets and Viissage Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00212
Filed: March 17, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff until September 25, 2009 to file a notice of appeal of this Court's Order and Judgment dated April 17, 2009; directing plaintiff to file the Notice of Appellate Filing Fee form, previously filed with the Clerk of the Cou rt, with the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals after he files the Notice of Appeal in this Court; and directing the Clerk of the Court from this point forward to provide a copy of all Court Orders to plaintiff by regular mail and by e-mail to amerinaa@hotmail.com. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 9/3/09. (bkp)
August 20, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time for appeal for fourteen days from the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk of the Court to mail to the plaintiff, along with this Order, a copy of the docket sheet and the Order and Judgment from which he seeks to appeal by regular mail, as well as by e-mail. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/20/09. (bkp)
April 17, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, andadjudged that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Further, the Court certifies,pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Judgment andthe accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 4/17/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameri v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasser Ahmed Ameri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bermard C Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viissage Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?