Fratesi v. Circus Circus Mississippi Inc

Plaintiff: Chloe Fratesi
Defendant: Circus Circus Mississippi Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00225
Filed: March 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to the confidentiality agreement, which has been made part of the settlement, the transcript shall remain under seal, except as set forth in the agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/02/2012. (kcs)
February 1, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the plaintiff has proven that the Casino is subject to personal jurisdiction in this case, for the reasons set forth in the 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/1/2012. (kpr)
January 31, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on 146 Objections, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/31/12. (kpr)
November 28, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/28/11. (kpr)
February 18, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declaring a mistrial and discharging the jury. The matter will be rescheduled for jury trial by separate order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/18/11. (bkp)
January 18, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/18/11. (bkp)
December 14, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Compel as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/14/10. (bkp)
March 17, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALED ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/17/10. (bkp) (The document was filed under seal on 3/24/2010, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.)
November 6, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Seal 34 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and ordering that it be placed under seal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/6/09. (bkp)
September 11, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Compel and directing deft to supplement its responses within 15 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/11/09. (bkp)
August 13, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/13/09. (bkp)
June 26, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay deadlines of the initial scheduling order pending a resolution of the jurisdiction issue. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/26/09. (mkf)
June 16, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Circus Circus Mississippi Inc. The Court will allow the parties 60 days in which to conduct discovery; plaintiff shall submit a supplemental response to the p ending motion to dismiss within 20 days of the completion of this discovery; deft will be allowed 15 days in which to reply; and the motion to dismiss will be held in abeyance. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/09. (bkp) Modified on 8/27/2009 to correct typographical error. (mkf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fratesi v. Circus Circus Mississippi Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chloe Fratesi
Represented By: Ted Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circus Circus Mississippi Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?