Codan Forsikring A/S v. ATS Logistics Services Inc

Plaintiff: Codan Forsikring A/S
Defendant: ATS Logistics Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00246
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 49:11702(a)(4) Violations of Interstate Commerce Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties that was entered on May 16, 2011 in the LEAD CASE NO. 4:08cv00368 (doc.#124), this consolidated action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/14/11. (vjt)
July 10, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Consolidate Cases; this case is hereby consolidated with 4:08-cv-00368; the court will issue a new Scheduling Order for the now consolidated action in due course. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/09. (mkf)
May 21, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 NOTICE of Related Case by Codan Forsikring A/S; Case Number 4:08cv368 filed by Codan Forsikring A/S that case will be reassigned to Judge Wright for resolution. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/21/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Codan Forsikring A/S v. ATS Logistics Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codan Forsikring A/S
Represented By: Charles E. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATS Logistics Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?