USA v. $4,720.00 in U. S. Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $4,720.00 in U. S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2009cv00266
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:841 Forfeiture Property-Drugs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/9/09. (bkp)
August 21, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Strike 8 Claim filed by Lisa Strong on June 10, 2009; and directing the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order along with the Motion to Strike to Lisa Strong, 1301 E. Kiehl Avenue, Sherwood, AR 72120. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/21/09. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Strike 2 Claim filed by Lisa Strong on May 1, 2009 for her failure to comply with Supplemental Rule G(5)(a)(i); and directing the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order along with the motion to strike, to Lisa Strong. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $4,720.00 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Karen D. Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,720.00 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?