Harris v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Eddy Stanley Harris, Jr.
Defendant: Larry B Norris
Case Number: 4:2009cv00276
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 51 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice; the relief is denied and the certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/10/11. (vjt)
February 2, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge H. David Young in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. The 18 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Eddy Stanley Harris, Jr is granted. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
August 6, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 13 Report and Recommendations; the Court finds the petition should not be dismissed; instead, the Court finds the petition should be stayed pending exhaustion of petitioner's state remedies; the Court declines to adopt t he Magistrate Judge's finding that a claim filed within forty-five days after judgment in this case would show diligence on the part of the petitioner; therefore, this case is STAYED and held in abeyance until further order of the Court; the Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case; Petitioner must file a motion to reopen the case after a final decision by the state court on his unexhausted claim.. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/6/09. (mkf)
July 23, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this petition be dismissed, without prejudice, due to the petitioner's failure to exhaust his available state court remedy 1 . Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/23/2009. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Stanley Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?