ElectroCraft Arkansas Inc v. Super Electric Motors Ltd et al

Plaintiff: ElectroCraft Arkansas Inc
Defendant: Super Electric Motors Ltd and Raymond O'Gara
Case Number: 4:2009cv00318
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that the parties have resolved all claims in this matter, hereby dismisses this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/5/10. (vjt)
September 16, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re court time limitations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/16/10. (bkp)
April 2, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a pleading within 20 days of the entry of this Order, addressing the impact, if any, of Innotex Precision on these proceedings and how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/2/10. (vjt)
March 31, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 39 Motion to Strike is denied, and pltf is allowed 21 days from the entry of this Order to file a sur-reply re Super Electric's motion for summary judgment 30 ; deferring ruling on summary judgment motions 30 43 until the response and reply, if any, have been filed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/31/10. (vjt)
December 23, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Super Electric's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/23/09. (mkf)
July 23, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Electrocraft Arkansas, Inc. up to and including August 7, 2009, in which to respond to the 4 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Raymond O'Gara and to respond to the counterclaim of Super Electric Motors Limited; and Super Electric Motors Limited shall have an extension of time to reply to the response to Super Electronic's motion to dismiss through and including August 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ElectroCraft Arkansas Inc v. Super Electric Motors Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ElectroCraft Arkansas Inc
Represented By: M. Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Electric Motors Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?