Eagle v. Henry et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin L Eagle
Defendant: Judy S Henry, Kimberly W Tucker, Wright Lindsey Jennings LLP, Bank of America and Nancy Hollis
Case Number: 4:2009cv00320
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/09. (bkp)
October 30, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER 84 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/30/09. (bkp)
October 28, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss and for the imposition of sanctions against plaintiff, dismissing case for plaintiff's failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted, and directing the Clerk of the Court to no longer accept any filings from Mr. Benjamin L. Eagle against these or against any defendants without approval from the court. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/09. (bkp)
October 14, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Quash; granting 60 Motion for Protective Order; and directing the parties to respond within 30 days to plaintiff's discovery requests following an entry of an order on each of the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/14/09. (bkp)
October 13, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motions to hold the Rule 26(f) conference in abeyance and to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference before a magistrate judge 42 43 44 49 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle v. Henry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin L Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy S Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly W Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Lindsey Jennings LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?