Wilson et al v. Wyeth et al

Plaintiff: Dawn Wilson and Thomas Wilson
Defendant: Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, Sherwood Family Medical Center P A, Donald Laurenzana and John Does
Case Number: 4:2009cv00343
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/7/11. (kpr)
May 9, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending all pre-trial ddls for 30 days from the date of this Order to allow the parties time to complete the settlement; and directing the parties to file a status report within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/9/11. (kpr)
April 21, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying all pending pre-trial ddls for 15 days from the date of this Order to allow the parties to complete the settlement. The parties are directed to file a status report within 15 days of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/21/11. (kpr)
March 1, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions and awarding defts Wyeth and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fees and cost of bringing this motion to compel and for sanctions and for the cost of reconvening Thomas Wilson's deposition. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/1/11. (kpr)
December 8, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and permitting Sean G. Saxon to appear pro hac vice for defts in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/8/10. (bkp)
December 2, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/2/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Stephen E. Oertle to appear for Wyeth and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/22/10. (bkp)
August 31, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Dismiss Party Sherwood Family Medical Center, P.A. and Donald Laurenzana, M.D.; Donald Laurenzana and Sherwood Family Medical Center PA are hereby dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear its own costs & fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/31/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Wilson
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wilson
Represented By: Phillip J. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Family Medical Center P A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Laurenzana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?