USA v. Mosby

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Lori A Mosby, T M, Change Your Life Inc, Pulaski County and Melvin Lacy
Case Number: 4:2009cv00353
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SALE re 111 MOTION for Order of Sale filed by USA. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/21/11. (kpr)
March 21, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Lori A Mosby for 2002, 2003, 2004, and 2005 federal income taxes, including accrued interest and other accrued statutory additions, in the amoaunt of $253,520.32, plus interest and statutory additions allowable by law from March 31, 2008, until the judgment is paid re 108 Stipulation for entry of final judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/21/11. (kpr)
September 9, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion to Dismiss Party as moot; denying 59 Motion to Dismiss; denying 60 Motion for Leave to File without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/9/10. (bkp)
January 6, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Dismissal dismissing the Pulaski County Treasurer from this case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/10. (bkp)
December 3, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Strike 22 Answer to Complaint filed by CYL. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Your Life Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?