Pate v. Yielding et al

Plaintiff: Luther S Pate, IV
Defendant: Geff Yielding, Vespa Holdings Inc, Vespa Beverages LLC, Vespa Beverages Inc and Vista Bottlers Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00371
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT AND STIPULATION. Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint and Defendant's Counterclaim are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/22/10. (dac)
July 17, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and dismissing deft Vista Bottlers, Inc. as a party to this action; granting 61 Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint within five days from the entry of this order; and granting 78 Motion to Intervene and directing Clifton H. Hoofman to file his complaint in intervention within five days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/17/09. (bkp)
July 15, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 98 MOTION to Produce filed by Luther S Pate, IV. Motion shall remain pending as to whether Plaintiff shall have access to the material sought for "all business activities of Vespa Beverages LLC.". Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/15/09. (dac)
June 11, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/11/09. (bkp)
May 14, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER to remain in effect pending the Court's hearing on plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction set for May 28, 2009, at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pate v. Yielding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther S Pate, IV
Represented By: Edward T. Oglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geff Yielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vespa Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vespa Beverages LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vespa Beverages Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Bottlers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?