Castro-Gomez v. Faulkner County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Castro-Gomez
Defendant: Faulkner County, Arkansas, Karl Byrd, John Randall and Bobby Brown
Case Number: 4:2009cv00381
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/20/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/8/10. (bkp)
July 31, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ; Defendant Faulkner County, Arkansas was inadvertently omitted from 7 Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/31/09. (mkf)
July 27, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 5 Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/27/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro-Gomez v. Faulkner County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Castro-Gomez
Represented By: Leonardo A. Monterrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?