Acre et al v. Spindletop Oil & Gas Company

Plaintiff: Robert Acre, Margaret Acre, Frances Smith, Russell Acre, Anita Acre, Paul Acre, Donna Acre, Jerry Pearson, Margaret Pearson, Donald McIntosh and Diane McIntosh
Defendant: Spindletop Oil & Gas Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv00421
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL upon settlement; all claims in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/20/12. (vjt)
February 22, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 Spindletop's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/22/11. (vjt)
February 18, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to submit their Pretrial Disclosure Sheets no later than Friday, February 25, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/18/11. (vjt)
January 31, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER if no response is filed by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, February 4, 2011, the Court will assume that the pltfs do not oppose deft's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/31/11. (vjt)
November 18, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Spindletop's claims against Chesapeake are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim; Chesapeake's motions to dismiss the third party complaint 5 16 are GRANTED; Chesapeake Exploration LLC and Chesapeake Exploration Limited Partnership terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acre et al v. Spindletop Oil & Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Acre
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Acre
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Smith
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Acre
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Acre
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Acre
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Acre
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Pearson
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Pearson
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald McIntosh
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane McIntosh
Represented By: David F. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spindletop Oil & Gas Company
Represented By: Gary D. Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?