Henson v. Hawker Beechcraft Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Robert Henson
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Corporation and Hawker Beechcraft Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00440
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 39 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Hawker Beechcraft Corporation, and Hawker Beechcraft Global Support Corporation, dismissing the complaint of Robert Henson with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/10/10. (vjt)
July 2, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the 7/19/10 trial with a new trial date & scheduling deadlines to be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/2/2010. (jct)
June 30, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Denise Hoggard, Kathlyn Graves, Megan Monsour and Terry Mann to bring electronic devices to the courthouse on 6/30/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/30/10. (vjt)
June 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines; Motions and Status Reports due by 6/7/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/10. (vjt)
May 19, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines; Motions and Status Reports due by 6/4/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. Hawker Beechcraft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henson
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?