Schultz v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Guy Schultz
Defendant: Charles Walker and Charles Sawrie
Case Number: 4:2009cv00460
Filed: June 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Guy Schultz against Charles Walker in the amount of $29,000.00. re 45 Jury Verdict. Pursuant to an earlier Order of the Court, the Court found that any jury aw ard for property damages will be offset by $40,450.00, so plaintiff will take nothing by the verdict. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/29/11. (kpr)
February 28, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 20 Motion in Limine. Accordingly, any jury award for property damages will be offset by $40,450.00. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/28/11. (kpr)
January 5, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel directing them to submit short, simultaneous letter briefs regarding the issues set forth in this Order by 5 p.m., January 12, 2011. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/5/11. (bkp)
November 29, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 20 Second MOTION in Limine directing the parties to respond by 12 p.m., December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/29/10. (bkp)
November 19, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion in Limine; granting 18 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/19/10. (bkp)
November 18, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss Party Charles Sawrie without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/18/10. (bkp)
October 26, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Party Superior Mats, LLC. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/26/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Schultz
Represented By: Roger A. Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?