Arkansas, State of v. General Warranty Services Inc

Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Defendant: General Warranty Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00485
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 47:521 Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 22 Order, in favor of Arkansas, State of against General Warranty Services Inc in the amount of $138,533.91. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/10/2010. (jct)
June 9, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ordering GWS to pay fines, penalties, damages, costs and fees to the State of Arkansas in the amount of $138,533.91. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Compel and denying defense counsel's renewed request to be relieved of counsel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/22/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas, State of v. General Warranty Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Kevin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Warranty Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?