Curtis v. Stewart et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius Curtis
Defendant: Stewart, Little Rock Police Department, Temple and Johanna
Case Number: 4:2009cv00519
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Curtis's 62 Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/22/2012. (dmn)
April 30, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR (duplicate of docket entry 53 ) - DISREGARD. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 4/30/2010 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
January 15, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to amend the docket sheet to reflect that defendant Temple is "Erick Temple," and defendant Johanna is "Christopher Johannes". Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/15/10. (bkp)
December 22, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: information contained in the personnel and disciplinary files produced by Defendants.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/22/2009. (thd)
October 6, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service appropriate for defts Officer Temple and Officer Johanna; dismissing defts Stewart and the Little Rock Police Dept., and directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/09. (bkp)
August 25, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/25/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?