Pressler v. FTS USA LLC

Plaintiff: Stephen Pressler
Defendant: FTS USA LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv00676
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Stephen Pressler against FTS USA LLC on his overtime claims, and is awarded damages in the amount of $8,840.76; pltf's minimum-wage claims against FTS are dismissed with prejudice; Pressler is also awarded $ ;50,073.75 in attorneys' fees and $3,307.60 in costs 125 ; the total amount of the Judgment is $62,222.11, which shall bear post-judgment interest at 0.19% from this order's date until the judgment is paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/3/11. (vjt)
June 2, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 116 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Ryan is awarded $30,386.25 in fees and $1,560.27 in costs; Donaldson is awarded $19,687.50 in fees and $1,747.33 in costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/2/11. (vjt)
December 9, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Pressler's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 58 FTS'S Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 90 FTS's Motion in Limine w/o prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/9/2010. (mkf)
July 21, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 47 Stipulation filed by FTS USA LLC and directing the parties to contact the Court no later than August 16, 2010, to reschedule the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/21/10. (bkp)
May 12, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltf's 20 Motion for Collective Action Under the FLSA is DENIED; granting pltf's 22 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to name UniTek USA, LLC, and Gabriel King as parties; pltf is directed to file the amended complaint within 7 days after entry of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/12/10. (vjt)
April 28, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Eric J. Bronstein to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for deft in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/28/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pressler v. FTS USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Pressler
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTS USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?