Smith et al v. Frac Tech Services LTD

Plaintiff: David Smith and Adam Sheedy
Defendant: Frac Tech Services LTD
Case Number: 4:2009cv00679
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' request that the Court extend retention of jurisdiction, up to and including 9/30/11, so that the terms of the settlement may be completed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/29/11. (vjt)
August 1, 2011 418 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 417 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by the parties, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE upon settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/1/11. (vjt)
June 15, 2011 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER at the hearing on 6/14/11, the pltfs withdrew their 367 Motion to Strike; therefore, that motion is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/15/11. (vjt)
May 5, 2011 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that deft's 372 Motion to Compel is denied as premature. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/5/11. (vjt)
January 11, 2011 358 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltfs' 219 motion for partial summary judgment for field engineers; denying as moot pltfs' 223 motion for partial summary judgment for service supervisors; Frac Tech's 237 mo tion for partial summary judgment re fluctuating work week is granted; denying pltfs' 243 motion to compel; Frac Tech's 248 motion for partial summary judgment re claims of David Dunn as field coordinator is denied; granting Frac Tech&# 039;s 257 motion for partial summary judgment re claims of Chris Giles as field coordinator; denying at this time Frac Tech's 260 motion to sever; granting Frac Tech's 262 motion to decertify the class of service supervisors; denying as moot Frac Tech's 264 motion for partial summary judgment re service supervisors; Frac Tech's 267 motion to decertify the class of field engineers is denied; granting in part and denying in part pltfs' 270 motion for partial su mmary judgment re claims of certain field coordinators; pltfs' 323 motion in limine is granted in part and denied in part; Frac Tech's 342 supplemental motion for partial summary judgment re service supervisors is denied as moot; and Frac Tech's 352 motion to strike is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/11/11. (vjt)
December 2, 2010 351 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 337 ORDER to clarify that Frac Tech's motion to supplement is granted in toto. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/2/10. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot deft's 254 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the claims of Robert Pulse. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (vjt)
October 28, 2010 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as to the claims of Brady Borden as safety coordinator and dismissing those claims with prejudice 231 ; finding as moot 245 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 251 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/10. (bkp)
October 22, 2010 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 309 Motion for Voluntary Nonsuit of Claiborne Lee; Claiborne Lee terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/22/10. (vjt)
October 6, 2010 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 278 MOTION for Voluntary Non-Suit by separate pltf Robert Pulse; the claims of Robert Pulse against deft are hereby dismissed with prejudice; Robert Pulse terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/6/10. (vjt)
September 30, 2010 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltfs' 217 Motion to Strike and for Protective Order is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of the pltfs to renew the motion after conferring in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/30/10. (vjt)
September 29, 2010 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 229 MOTION to Dismiss the claims of Jason Sanderfer and Brandon Smith without prejudice; Jason Sanderfer and Brandon Smith terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/29/10. (vjt)
September 27, 2010 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 213 Motion for Reconsideration; Frac Tech will be permitted to depose Dan Quick as directed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/10. (vjt)
September 2, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING pltfs' 196 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended and Substituted Complaint; pltfs must file their Fifth Amended Complaint within 7 days from the entry of this Order, and are directed to delete paragraph 67 before filing the ame nded complaint; the motion for leave to amend is construed as a motion to dismiss without prejudice the following pltfs: Lincoln Sheedy, Brad Morton, James Fay, Adam Davenport, Chad Hardin, Taylor Oram, Jose Herrera, and Robert Holguin; the motion is granted and the claims of those persons are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/2/10. (vjt)
September 1, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltfs' 192 194 Motion to Quash Subpoenas is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/10. (vjt)
February 26, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Pltfs' 134 MOTION to Join in a Collective Action a class consisting of Frac Tech Field Engineers is GRANTED; the Court hereby conditionally certifies a class of Frac Tech Field Engineers as a collective action; the proposed notice is approved and the deadline for Field Engineers to file consents to participate in this collective action will be 4/6/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/26/10. (vjt)
December 11, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time up to and including January 13, 2010 in which to file an opt-in or consent to join the suit and authorizing the parties to amend the form of the notice to reflect the ddl as January 13, 2010, and that the trial is scheduled to begin on November 29, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/11/09. (bkp)
November 24, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltfs' 37 MOTION to Approve Notice and Consent to Join Collective Action is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the Court approves notice and certification of a collective action including Frac Tech Service Supervisors, but not including other employment categories or positions. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/24/09. (vjt)
October 28, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 41 Motion to Continue; denying w/o prejudice as premature 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/09. (mkf)
October 7, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/7/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Frac Tech Services LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Sheedy
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frac Tech Services LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?