Fuller v. Dillard's Inc

Plaintiff: Linda Fuller
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00709
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/28/11. (vjt)
September 22, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/22/10. (bkp)
July 28, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Pursuant to Stipulation and Agreement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/28/10. (bkp)
May 11, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss; denying 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/10. (bkp)
April 5, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Continuance. Defendant's response to 26 Motion to Compel is extended to 5/7/2010. The 5/5/2010 jury trial is cancelled; a new scheduling order will be issued. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/5/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Dillard's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Fuller
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?