Duren et al v. E I duPont de Nemours and Company et al

Plaintiff: James Duren, Ann Duren, J J's Truck Stop Inc and Al's Truck Stop of Malvern Inc
Defendant: E I duPont de Nemours and Company and John Does
Case Number: 4:2009cv00713
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion for Costs, as set forth in this Order. The Court directs the Clerk to tax in costs $18,911.92 against DuPont. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/12. (kpr)
July 19, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on 127 81 Orders in favor of J J's Truck Stop Inc against E I DuPont De Nemours and Company in the amount of $28,829.83 and postjudgment interest as provided by law; in favor of Al's Truck Stop of Malvern Inc against E I DuPont De Nemours and Company in the amount of $197,800.00 and postjudgment interest as provided by law; dismissing James and Ann Duren's claim against DePont with prejudice. Postjudgment interest will accrue at 0.20% per annum from today's date until the judgments are paid. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/12. (kpr)
July 10, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing those named herein to bring certain electronics into the courthouse for the jury trial during the week of 9 July 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2012. (mkf)
July 6, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER attaching the Court's first working draft of the final jury instructions. Counsel is directed to be prepared to talk more on the issues set forth in this Order at the end of the day on Monday. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/6/12. (kpr)
July 5, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re voir dire questions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/12. (kpr)
June 29, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 94 Motion in Limine; granting 95 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 96 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/12. (kpr)
June 28, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (duplicate). (Docket entry modified on 6/28/2012 to indicate the document was filed in error.) (hph).
June 27, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing those persons named herein to bring certain electronics into the courthouse for the pretrial conference on June 28, 2012, and the trial during the week of July 9, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/27/12. (kpr)
October 14, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duren et al v. E I duPont de Nemours and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Duren
Represented By: Brett David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Duren
Represented By: Brett David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J J's Truck Stop Inc
Represented By: Brett David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al's Truck Stop of Malvern Inc
Represented By: Brett David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I duPont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?